Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified information measured by the Baseline Tobacco Study; requiring a local health officer to identify a specified coalition and to identify specified programs, evaluate the effectiveness of specified programs, and develop a specified plan with the assistance of a specified coalition before applying for specified grants; requiring a specified plan to include a list of members of a specified coalition; requiring a local health officer, in consultation with a specified coalition, to update a specified plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136087/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {136087/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Rules 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - Modifications
(   13-1003, 13-1008, 13-1009, 13-1101, 13-1107, 13-1109, 13-1110, 13-1114, 13-1115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page