Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require certain persons who are convicted of, or granted probation before judgment for, certain criminal offenses to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for certain periods of time.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0672
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0952 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page