Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the due date to December 31, 2021, by which the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties is required to submit a report on certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly; and extending the termination date for the Task Force to June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page