Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Terrasa
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain firefighters, rescue squad members, advance life support unit members, police officers, sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, correctional officers, and certain health care workers and child care workers, who are suffering from the effects of severe acute respiratory syndrome coronavirus 2 are presumed, under certain circumstances, to have an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty or course of employment and is compensable in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page