Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; altering the circumstances under which counties and municipal corporations may act as an aggregator; establishing the Community Choice Aggregator Pilot Program; establishing a process by which, beginning on January 1, 2023, a certain county may form a community choice aggregator; requiring a certain county to develop a plan and give notice of a certain aggregation plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 4:17 PM
Click to return on the top page