Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Mangione
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; and requiring the Secretary of General Services to distribute certain broker rebate fees to the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0260
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Smith) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2022 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page