Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Jones, Allen, Foley, Guyton, Healey, Holmes, and J. Long
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund to provide sailing, boating, kayaking, canoeing, and paddleboarding and surfing opportunities for individuals with disabilities and service-disabled veterans; requiring the Department of Disabilities to administer the Fund; prohibiting the Department from providing a grant of more than $40,000 in a fiscal year; and establishing the qualifications for certain nonprofit organizations to receive a grant from the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {603620/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-1101, 7-1102 )
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page