Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Jobs Court Pilot Program in the District Court sitting in Baltimore City to reduce recidivism by offering defendants an opportunity to participate in full-time job training and job placement programs as a condition of probation, an alternative to incarceration, or a condition of pretrial release; and requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to take certain actions including providing a certain report, in consultation with the Baltimore Workforce Development Board, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-24)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363724/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-25)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {643221/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (107-24) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363724/1 Adopted 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (108-25) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Text - Chapter - Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:26 PM
Click to return on the top page