Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Carey, and Jameson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that specified provisions of law do not prohibit insurance producers from charging and collecting from insureds actual expenses incurred by the insurance producer for payment of the premium for a policy by use of a credit card, subject to specified conditions; requiring an insurance producer, under specified circumstances, to fully disclose the availability of all acceptable payment methods and any charge for actual expenses incurred by the insurance producer for payment of a premium by use of a credit card; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0094
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533194/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {533194/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Finance 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text - Chapter - Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
(   27-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page