Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to the Commission on Juvenile Justice Reform and Emerging and Best Practices; altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child of a certain age alleged to have committed a certain offense; altering certain provisions relating to the taking of a child into custody by a law enforcement officer; expanding certain provisions of law relating to the entry onto certain school or other property by, and the education of, certain sex offender registrants; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0744
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {173629/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {283320/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {513928/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted (97-35)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {893223/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {383728/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (32-102)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {133022/1 (Delegate Acevero) Rejected
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {533628/1 (Delegate Young) Rejected
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {533729/1 (Delegate Young) Rejected
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-6)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {343329/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-26)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-8)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law - Reform
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Reform
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {823123/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Motion Special Order until 02/28 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {173629/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {283320/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {513928/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted (97-35) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {893223/1 (Chair, Judiciary Committee) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {383728/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (32-102) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {133022/1 (Delegate Acevero) Rejected 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {533628/1 (Delegate Young) Rejected 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Floor Amendment {533729/1 (Delegate Young) Rejected 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2024 2/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Reform
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (126-6) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {563727/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Floor Amendment {343329/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-26) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (114-8) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Juvenile Law - Reform
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page