Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Wu, Arentz, Buckel, Hartman, Hill, Hutchinson, T. Morgan, Simmons, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Nuclear Energy Development Task Force to study and make recommendations on the deployment of nuclear power generation resources and other related technologies in the State and the establishment of a permanent nuclear energy commission in the State; and requiring the Task Force to report by December 30, 2025, on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:10 PM
Click to return on the top page