Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Adams, Arikan, Buckel, Ghrist, Hornberger, Howard, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, Parrott, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Thiam
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs; requiring the Task Force to determine a strategy for enhancing long-term civic education; and requiring the Task Force to make its recommendations regarding a plan for implementing a civic education program in a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0723 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Task Force to Evaluate Existing School Civic Literacy Programs
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page