Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring hotel rental tax revenue in Calvert County to be distributed to the Tourism Development Incentive Fund; and requiring funds in the Tourism Development Incentive Fund to be distributed to the general fund of the county, certain municipalities, and as grants to certain businesses and organization for the fees required to hold special events and to market Calvert County to potential visitors.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {723827/1 Adopted 34AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Last Updated: 8/10/2022 11:15 AM
Click to return on the top page