Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a certain prohibition on State interference with a certain decision to terminate a pregnancy at a certain time does not apply to a decision to terminate a pregnancy because the fetus has a prenatal diagnosis of Down syndrome except in cases where the fetus was conceived as a result of rape or incest or in cases of medical emergency.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1583 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Abortions - Prenatal Diagnosis of Down Syndrome (Down Syndrome Dignity Act)
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
(   20-1501, 20-209 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page