Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Homeowner Protection Program in the Department of Assessments and Taxation for the purpose of diverting vulnerable homeowners from the private tax lien sale process into an alternative program with the intent of minimizing tax collection costs to owners, assisting owners to pay their taxes, and allowing owners to remain in their homes; establishing the Homeowner Protection Fund consisting of tax and interest payments made by homeowners and a $750,000 appropriation to the Fund in Fiscal years 2023 to 2025; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {685860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {449532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {685860/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {449532/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
(   14-811, 14-812, 14-880, 14-883 through 14-891 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page