Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including child welfare data in the data collected, organized, managed, disaggregated, and analyzed by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; requiring the Center to conduct research on the educational and economic impact of child welfare programs; requiring the Center to develop a data dashboard that is published annually on the Center's website on students who are dually enrolled; requiring the Center to publish on its website an easy-to-understand graphic data dashboard on former children in out-of-home placements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0711 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {205069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-20)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Out-of-Home Placement Data
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {205069/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-20) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
(   24-701, 24-702, 24-703, 24-703.1, 24-707 )
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page