Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegate Hartman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a life-threatening injury to another as a result of the person's driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel in a criminally negligent manner; exempting certain conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; and establishing a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 1 year or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both for a violation of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0017
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0352 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {372514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-7)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {372514/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (127-7) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-212.1 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:14 PM
Click to return on the top page