Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renewable Energy Credits - Solar Energy Sources
Sponsored by
Delegate Boyce
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility of solar energy sources for meeting certain portions of Tier 1 requirements of the renewable energy portfolio standard to require that the source is only eligible if it is connected with the electric distribution grid serving Maryland.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renewable Energy Credits - Solar Energy Sources
House 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page