Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Howard County Board of Education to bear the burden of proof in due process proceedings that initiate from a due process complaint regarding the provision of special education services or a program for a child with disabilities in Howard County except under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743725/1 Adopted 34AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page