Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2022, or later.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0065
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0098 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613390/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {383828/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-93)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {413127/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (40-91)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183428/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (41-90)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {613390/1 Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {383828/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (40-93) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {413127/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (40-91) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {183428/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (41-90) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Finance 28BClick to view Recorded Media
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page