Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions requiring a certain court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a certain case involving a child to order the child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a certain determination, except under certain circumstances; requiring a certain child to be held in a certain secure juvenile facility while the child is awaiting trial or other legal process, except under certain circumstances; providing Baltimore City is not required to comply with the provisions of the Act until October 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-22)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {573929/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page