Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Clarity Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain provisions governing signage at retail service stations supersede inconsistent local law; altering a signage requirement for retail service stations relating to the price of regular gasoline so that the signage prominently displays clearly and visibly the credit and debit price, if higher than the cash price, or the credit and debit price and the cash price; repealing an exemption from a certain signage requirement for retail service station dealers with not more than 3 dispensing units; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0651
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-15)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation – Sale of Motor Fuel – Pricing Signage (Gas Price Gouging Act)
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303521/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Clarity Act)
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (120-15) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page