Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the authorized use of certain premiums transferred to the Annuity Bond Fund from the sale of State bonds to include paying for capital projects and, if necessary or appropriate from time to time to comply with the requirements of the Internal Revenue Code, any other use authorized by the Internal Revenue Code.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-36)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {229234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 17BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-36) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {229234/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Text - Chapter - State Debt – Annuity Bond Fund – Use of Bond Premiums
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:16 PM
Click to return on the top page