Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Gas – Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement – Surcharge and Plans
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the inclusion of certain project costs under the Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement Program in certain gas company base rates during a multiyear rate plan; and providing for the continuation of a certain surcharge for eligible future infrastructure project costs not included in base rates.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983598/1
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983598/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Natural Gas – Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement – Surcharge and Plans
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {983598/1 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {983598/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Gas – Strategic Infrastructure Development and Enhancement – Surcharge and Plans
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Finance 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page