Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Organization Task Force
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Organization Task Force to study and make recommendations concerning the membership, purpose, and function of an organization to govern the renovation, revitalization, financing, and ongoing maintenance and management of the Baltimore Convention site and certain surrounding areas; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the Governor, and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0896
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {563822/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {653626/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/5/2024 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page