Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland People's Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Ivey, and Martinez
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland People's Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; and requiring the Comptroller to distribute to the Fund 25% of the Maryland estate tax.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0089 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland People's Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland People's Fund - Establishment
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 8:32 PM
Click to return on the top page