Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Out-of-State Licensing Reciprocity - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists to conduct a study and make recommendations on licensure reciprocity for out-of-state clinical marriage and family therapists licensed in Virginia and the District of Columbia.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Out-of-State Licensing Reciprocity - Study
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:00 PM
Click to return on the top page