Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prekindergarten - Ulysses Currie Head Start Program - Eligibility for State Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Edelson, Harris, Smith, Solomon, and Wolek
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a provider in the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program to receive certain State funds under certain circumstances; and exempting providers in the Program from certain State requirements for eligible prekindergarten providers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-2)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Prekindergarten - Ulysses Currie Head Start Program - Eligibility for State Funds
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prekindergarten - Ulysses Currie Head Start Program - Eligibility for State Funds
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (125-2) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page