Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each carrier to inform members and beneficiaries of the procedure to request a referral to a specialist or nonphysician specialist who is not part of the carrier's provider panel; establishing a certain requirement on certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations related to the provision of certain mental health and substance use disorder services provided to a member by a nonparticipating provider; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1165 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {383920/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Coverage for Nonparticipation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:45 AM
Click to return on the top page