Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County – Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees – Membership
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain numbers of members of the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County and the Board of Community College Trustees for Washington County shall belong to certain political parties based on the aggregate number of votes in the preceding election of the Board of County Commissioners.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0855
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Washington County – Board of License Commissioners and Board of Community College Trustees – Membership
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:13 PM
Click to return on the top page