Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to increase the rate of the transfer tax imposed on certain written instruments conveying title to property or a leasehold interest in real property, subject to a certain exception; requiring any revenue derived from a higher transfer tax rate to be distributed to a certain special fund; establishing a Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund and requiring that certain revenue attributable to certain transfer and recordation tax rates be paid into the fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0566
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {133628/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (38-89)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {143122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-88)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-39)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {333923/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {310112/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Floor Amendment {133628/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (38-89) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Floor Amendment {143122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (43-88) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-39) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Floor Amendment {333923/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-11-111, 4-11-122, 4-3A-102 )
Last Updated: 8/2/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page