Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsored by
Delegate Johnson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact is to regulate the practice of telepsychology across state boundaries; establishing certain criteria and duties for compact states; requiring certain psychologists to hold a certain license from a home state and meet certain eligibility requirements to exercise certain authority to practice interjurisdictional telepsychology and certain temporary authority to practice in-person, face-to-face psychology in certain compact states; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0500
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {536083/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {536083/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Returned Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Text - Chapter - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page