Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Branch
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution; providing for the membership, composition, chair and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the workgroup to study certain issues including the timely disposition of deposit money when a dispute arises between buyer and seller; and requiring the Workgroup to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, recommendations for any legislation needed to clarify the manner in which real estate trust money is distributed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743095/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Real Estate - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Prohibition
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {743095/1 Adopted 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Referred Rules 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/26/2021 11:59 AM
Click to return on the top page