Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Indian Head Highway PG 306-24
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing civil penalties for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems on Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) in Prince George's County that are second or subsequent violations or that involve exceeding the maximum speed limit by certain amounts.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0431 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Indian Head Highway PG 306-24
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:15 PM
Click to return on the top page