Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State to pay reasonable attorney's fees incurred in representing an alleged disabled person who is indigent in a petition for the appointment of a guardian of the property of the person; and requiring the court, under certain circumstances, to appoint, for the alleged disabled person, an attorney who has contracted with the Department of Human Services.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0694
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0477 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Text - Chapter - Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page