Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a process by which a defective corporate act may be ratified by a board of directors of a corporation; requiring a corporation ratifying a defective corporate act that would have required a filing with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to file articles of validation with the Department; authorizing an adversely affected person or entity to file an action contesting a ratification under the Act; and applying the Act to real estate investment trusts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0879
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483327/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text - Chapter - Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:56 AM
Click to return on the top page