Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Metzgar
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law providing for the prosecution for murder or manslaughter of a viable fetus under certain circumstances; declaring the intent of the General Assembly regarding the provision of equal protection for all unborn human beings within the State; providing that the General Assembly acknowledges that certain federal or State laws, regulations, executive orders, or court opinions that are contrary to certain findings are void; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Equal Protection for Unborn Human Life Act
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
(   2-103, 2A-101 through 2A-103 )
(   15-103, 20-103, 20-208, 20-209 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page