Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Attorney General - Investigative Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Boyce, Harris, Lehman, and Taveras
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Office of the Attorney General to subpoena persons or evidence, administer oaths, and take depositions and other testimony to investigate fraud, waste, abuse of Maryland Department of Health funds, or certain behavior in the Department; and authorizing the Office to petition a court to compel compliance with a certain order or subpoena or testimony or the production of evidence under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - Office of the Attorney General - Investigative Authority
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 3/1/2024 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page