Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to open a special or other enrollment period for an individual who consents to share information through a certain system; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to begin implementing a system, by September 1, 2021, through which an individual who has filed a claim for benefits may consent to the sharing of relevant information by the Department with the Exchange and the Maryland Department of Health to determine whether the individual qualifies for free or low-cost insurance; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Revisions and Required Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-34)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Revisions and Required Study
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {283892/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Finance 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {133223/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-34) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
(   31-108 )
(   8-109, 8-110, 8-809 )
Last Updated: 5/26/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page