Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Community Violence Prevention Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, beginning July 1, 2023, to provide community violence prevention services; establishing requirements for prevention professionals seeking certification as a certified violence prevention professional and entities that employ or contract with certified violence prevention professionals; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to approve at least one training and certification program for violence prevention professionals by January 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-33)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Community Violence Prevention Services
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Community Violence Prevention Services
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (100-33) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 504
Text - Chapter - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Community Violence Prevention Services
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page