Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to enter into an agreement with an owner of real property who is engaged in constructing or operating housing structures or projects for the payment of a negotiated amount in lieu of county property taxes on the property; requiring property that is subject to a payment in lieu of taxes agreement to be used for a housing structure or project that is acquired, constructed, or rehabilitated under certain programs or acquired under a Right of First Refusal program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {779039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {779039/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
(   7-506.3 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page