Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain venison donation programs to report the name and home address of each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit and the number of deer donated by each donor who intended to claim the income tax credit to the Comptroller by January 31 each year; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2021, on the testing of deer brought to deer processors for chronic wasting disease; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0769
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {725767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation – Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {725767/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Returned Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Reporting Requirement and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page