Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from one to three the number of students authorized to work under the supervision of a master barber.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text - Chapter - Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page