Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Insurance Administration jointly to conduct a study of Maryland Medical Assistance Program and commercial health insurance coverage to measure the number and percentage of individuals who have been denied health coverage for the treatment of an intellectual disability from July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, both inclusive; and requiring the Department and the Administration to jointly report their findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2025.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0945
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities - Study
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:17 PM
Click to return on the top page