Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Amprey, Barve, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Terrasa, and Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to publish a fact sheet on the protection of pets in the event of an eviction or other loss of possession of real property to be included with a certain notice or summons; requiring a landlord to provide information about the fact sheet at the execution of a lease on or after October 1, 2022; requiring a sheriff or other official to return a pet to a tenant or certain other person or to contact an animal shelter or rescue organization; prohibiting leaving a pet on public property; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0816
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-1)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {223324/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-1) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-701 through 14-706 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page