Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a community-based organization to establish an overdose prevention site pilot program with the approval of the Maryland Department of Health and in consultation with the local health department; requiring a program to acquire gas chromatograph mass spectrometer machines for drug sample testing; requiring the Secretary of Health to provide to a program a grant equal to the costs incurred by the program to acquire gas chromatograph mass spectrometer machines; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Overdose Prevention Site Pilot Program
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   24-2401 through 24-2406 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:19 PM
Click to return on the top page