Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Supplemental Rebate Program - Subscription Model for Hepatitis C Therapies
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before December 1, 2021, the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a State plan amendment that authorizes the State to enter into value-based arrangements with drug manufacturers through supplemental rebate agreements and seeks an approval that authorizes a subscription model for hepatitis C therapies; requiring, to the extent possible, the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration certain other State agencies, to develop a certain subscription model; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Supplemental Rebate Program - Subscription Model for Hepatitis C Therapies
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page