Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Transferring specified individuals into the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; requiring an individual who is transferred into the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System to make specified deposits in the annuity savings fund of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to make specified transfers to the specified accumulation fund and annuity savings fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {684160/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
(   26-201, 26-202, 26-203.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page