Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1030
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for a performing arts theater license in Harford County by altering the definition of "performing arts theater" and authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a certain for-profit theater, rather than a nonprofit theater; authorizing the holder of the license to sell liquor for on-premises consumption in addition to beer and wine; and altering the license fee from $500 to $1,500.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753823/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1030
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {753823/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1030
Text - Chapter - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Performing Arts Theater License
Last Updated: 5/28/2024 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page