Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Care Facilities – Cybersecurity for Hospitals
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to adopt minimum cybersecurity standards for hospitals and take certain other actions related to the cybersecurity of hospitals, including supporting hospitals that do not meet the minimum cybersecurity standards; requiring hospitals to comply with the cybersecurity standards adopted by the Commission; and requiring the Secretary of Health to consider cybersecurity standards for hospitals when issuing a license to a hospital.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission – Health Care Facilities – Cybersecurity for Hospitals
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:20 PM
Click to return on the top page